Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Burnell

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1275SelectedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
7 Apr 1275Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
25 Oct 1292DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Burnell:
Bishop Robert Burnell (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 64
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013