Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John of Halton

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Apr 1292SelectedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
14 Sep 1292Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
1 Nov 1324DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John of Halton:
Bishop John of Halton (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

  • a bishop for 32.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 289
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 68
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013