Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Button

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Feb 1267SelectedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
17 Apr 1267Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 1274DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Button
Bishop William Button (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFornham

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 63
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 132
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,886

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast