Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antony Beck

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jul 1283SelectedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
9 Jan 1284Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
4 May 1306AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
3 Mar 1311DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Antony Beck:
Patriarch Antony Beck (died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 231
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 66
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014