Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Brisciano

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hippos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1751BornSiracusa
18 Dec 177322.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Siracusa, Italy
28 May 177422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Siracusa, Italy
25 May 181866.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
Jun 1818³66.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
1830¹78.5DiedTitular Bishop of Hippos

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Brisciano
Bishop Sebastiano Brisciano (born , died 1830) Titular Bishop of Hippos

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 215
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016