Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pranciškaus Brazys, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Zella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1915Born
15 Aug 193217.4EnteredMember of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
19 Dec 194227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
22 Dec 196449.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zella
14 Feb 196549.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zella
9 Jun 196752.3DiedTitular Bishop of Zella

MicroData Summary for Pranciškaus Brazys (VIAF: 120242127)
Bishop Pranciškaus Brazys M.I.C. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Zella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalsupisi

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ente/c1: CB, 10 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Jan 2019

Quantcast