Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Bratti

Deceased

Bishop of Forli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1759BornCapo d'Istria
20 Dec 178324.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 180747.7AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
27 Dec 180748.0Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
11 Nov 183575.8DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Bratti:
Bishop Andrea Bratti (born , died ) Bishop of Forli

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 26
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015