Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Audley

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jul 1480AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 1480Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
22 Jun 1492AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
10 Jan 1502AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
23 Aug 1524DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Audley
Bishop Edmund Audley (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

EventPlace
Death PlaceRamsbury

  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,472
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 466
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 163, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 230
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 568, and Page 605
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 93
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,697
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1480, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast