Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Kempe

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1414¹Born
20 Aug 144834.6AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
8 Feb 145036.1Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 148975.2DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Kempe
Bishop Thomas Kempe (born 1414, died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopYork House, Westminster, Diocese of London, England

  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 297
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 180
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 90
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast