Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lionel Wydville (Woodville)

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1482AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
21 Apr 1482Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
23 Jun 1484DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Lionel Wydville (Woodville)
Bishop Lionel Wydville (Woodville) (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 230
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 93
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,698

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast