Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Stafford

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1424AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
27 May 1425Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
13 May 1443AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
25 May 1452DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Stafford
Archbishop John Stafford (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 26.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 22, and Page 140
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 130
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast