Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Hales

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Sep 1459AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
25 Nov 1459Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
30 Dec 1490DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Hales
Bishop John Hales (died ) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKenadon, Devonshire
Ordained BishopS. Clément, Chapel, Coventry, Diocese of Coventry and Lichfield, England

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 554
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 135
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 91
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1459, Number 7
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,703

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast