Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Grey

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1450AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
21 Jun 1454AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
8 Sep 1454Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
4 Aug 1478DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for William Grey
Bishop William Grey (died ) Bishop of Ely

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMortlake
Death PlaceDownham
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Ely, Diocese of Ely, England

  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 339
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 150
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 91
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1454, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast