Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Valier (Valeri, Valieri)

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1531Born
15 May 156534.1AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
12 Dec 158352.6Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jan 158553.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marco
8 Feb 158755.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
14 Mar 159765.9ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
1 Jun 160574.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
23 May 160675.1DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Valier (Valeri, Valieri) (VIAF: 62367445)
Agostino Cardinal Valier (Valeri, Valieri) (born , died ) Bishop of Verona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Marco, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Verona, Diocese of Verona

  • a cardinal for 22.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast