Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo de’ Marchesi Bisleti

Deceased

Bishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1814BornVeroli
11 Mar 183722.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 184733.1AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
10 Oct 184733.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
23 Jun 185439.9AppointedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
28 Jun 186853.9DiedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo de’ Marchesi Bisleti:
Bishop Camillo de’ Marchesi Bisleti (born , died ) Bishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 227, and Page 483

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013