Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Ripa

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hebron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1667BornGiffoni
22 Dec 169124.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 172961.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
25 Jan 173365.1DiedTitular Bishop of Hebron

MicroData Summary for Matthew Ripa:
Bishop Matthew Ripa (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hebron

  • a priest for 41.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015