Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Mariano Carmelo Benzo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

Titular Bishop of Constantina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1769BornPalermo
28 Apr 179324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jun 182859.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
23 Jun 182859.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantina
Sep 1828²59.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantina
18 Nov 185687.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Mariano Carmelo Benzo
Bishop Giulio Mariano Carmelo Benzo O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 161
  • ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016