Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Müller

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1584BornTrübenbach
161631.9Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
28 Apr 163147.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
28 Apr 163147.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
1 May 163147.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
20 Oct 164460.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Müller:
Bishop Sebastian Müller (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 91, Number 544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Mar 2015