Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Tagliacarne

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse, France


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1534AppointedBishop of Grasse, France
17 May 1534Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
18 Oct 1536DiedBishop of Grasse, France

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Tagliacarne
Bishop Benedetto Tagliacarne (died ) Bishop of Grasse

EventPlace
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 205
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1534, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast