Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Foscari

Deceased

Bishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505¹Born
16 May 152621.3AppointedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
1 May 154237.3Ordained BishopBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
2 Jan 156358.0DiedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Foscari
Bishop Girolamo Foscari (born 1505, died ) Bishop of Torcello (Turris)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria del Popolo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 315
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Treccani.it, 25 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1542, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Sep 2017