Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Cardinal Baroni Peretti Montalto

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1572BornMontalto, Italy
5 Jun 159623.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159623.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
15 Mar 160027.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
13 Nov 161745.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
11 Jan 162148.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
5 May 162148.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
24 Oct 162148.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
16 Sep 162451.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
30 Nov 162452.0Ordained BishopBishop of Palestrina
2 Mar 162653.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
14 Apr 162754.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
4 Aug 162956.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Andrea Baroni Peretti Montalto:
Cardinal Andrea Baroni Peretti Montalto (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
  • a cardinal for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 5, and Page 38
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 86, Number 514

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013