Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicasio Balisa y Melero, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Cybistra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1893Born
11 Oct 191117.8ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
11 Apr 192026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
14 Jan 194147.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia
14 Jan 194147.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cybistra
24 Aug 194147.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cybistra
3 Feb 196571.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Nicasio Balisa y Melero
Bishop Nicasio Balisa y Melero O.A.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Casanare

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOngoz, Spain

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast