Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Bacoué, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Glandèves


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornCastel Galoux
15 Oct 167264.7SelectedBishop of Glandèves, France
27 Nov 167365.9ConfirmedBishop of Glandèves, France
24 Jun 167466.4Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
1684²76.0ResignedBishop of Glandèves, France
13 Feb 169486.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Glandèves, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léon Bacoué:
Bishop Léon Bacoué O.F.M. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Glandèves

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015