Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Quasina

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1721BornSassari
23 Dec 174726.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 176846.5SelectedBishop of Bosa, Italy
16 May 176846.6ConfirmedBishop of Bosa, Italy
24 Jul 176846.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
Jan 1785³63.3DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Quasina:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Quasina (born , died Jan 1785) Bishop of Bosa

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1781
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 127
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,486
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015