Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Arregui, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664¹BornBuenos Aires
22 Nov 173066.8AppointedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
25 Jan 173369.0Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Dec 173672.9DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Arregui:
Bishop Juan de Arregui O.F.M. (born 1664, died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015