Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentinus Matthias Arcemberski

Deceased

Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1666Born
1 Jan 170235.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Apr 170236.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 171549.2AppointedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
28 Jul 171549.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
1717¹50.8DiedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valentinus Matthias Arcemberski
Bishop Valentinus Matthias Arcemberski (born , died 1717) Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorcen
Ordained BishopVarsovie

  • a priest for 14.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,510

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast