Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ludovico Agnello Anastasio

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1690³BornNapoli
24 Sep 171828.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 172434.8AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
27 Dec 172434.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
12 May 175565.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
19 Feb 175868.0DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Agnello Anastasio:
Patriarch Ludovico Agnello Anastasio (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 366
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015