Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Jean-Baptiste Amoudru, O.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Leningrad, Russian Federation

Titular Bishop of Pyrgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1878Born
21 Sep 190123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Aug 193455.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Leningrad, Russian Federation
15 Aug 193455.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pyrgos
30 Apr 193556.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pyrgos
12 Oct 196183.1DiedApostolic Administrator of Leningrad, Russian Federation

MicroData Summary for Maurice Jean-Baptiste Amoudru
Bishop Maurice Jean-Baptiste Amoudru O.P. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Leningrad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDôle

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 30
  • b: CB, 29 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast