Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Félix Amat Palau y Pont

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra

Titular See: (Abbot/San Ildefenso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1750BornSabadell, Spain
26 Sep 180353.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
6 Nov 180353.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
11 Nov 183484.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra

MicroData Summary for Félix Amat Palau y Pont:
Archbishop Félix Amat Palau y Pont (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Palmyra

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 124, Number 661

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013