Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alvarez de Caldas

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542¹BornCaldas
12 Jan 160563.0AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
29 May 160563.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
14 May 161270.3AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
30 Nov 161573.9DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Alvarez de Caldas:
Bishop Juan Alvarez de Caldas (died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 65, and Page 267
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 121, Number 769
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015