Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Mesía de Tovar

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹BornVillacastín
18 Jun 161246.5AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
21 Sep 161246.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
27 Feb 161650.2AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
13 Jul 163670.5DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Mesía de Tovar:
Bishop Alfonso Mesía de Tovar (died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 98, and Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013