Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Álvaro Cardinal Cienfuegos Villazón, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola

Apostolic Administrator of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1657BornAgüerina-Miranda, Spain
30 Sep 172063.5Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jan 172163.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Catania, Italy
16 Jul 172164.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
26 May 172265.2Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
21 Feb 172567.9AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
15 Nov 173578.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pécs, Hungary
24 Apr 173982.1ResignedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
18 Aug 173982.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan Álvaro Cienfuegos Villazón:
Juan Álvaro Cardinal Cienfuegos Villazón S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
  • a cardinal for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1720
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 40, Number 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015