Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Basile, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Matteo di Pareta)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1673Born
7 Oct 169622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
1727²53.1AppointedMinister General of Order of Observant Friars Minor
1729²55.1ResignedMinister General of Order of Observant Friars Minor
21 Jul 173157.7SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
3 Sep 173157.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
16 Sep 173157.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
Jan 1736³62.1DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Basile
Archbishop Paolo Basile O.F.M. Obs. (born , died Jan 1736) Archbishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePareta

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast