Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcello Cardinal Passari

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1678BornAriano, Italy
10 Jun 170224.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Jun 170224.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 173152.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
11 Mar 173152.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
28 Sep 173355.3Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 173355.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
25 Sep 174163.3DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

MicroData Summary for Marcello Passari:
Cardinal Marcello Passari (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1733

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013