Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Galletti

Deceased

Bishop of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1664BornSan Cataldo
3 May 169227.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 172358.8AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
5 Sep 172358.9Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
28 Nov 172965.1AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
6 Apr 175792.4DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Galletti:
Bishop Pietro Galletti (born , died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013