Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michelangelo Gentili

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1664BornAgnone
18 Dec 168824.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 172257.8AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
19 Jul 172257.9Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
Sep 172965.0DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Gentili:
Bishop Michelangelo Gentili Bishop of Belcastro

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c3+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013