Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista del Tufo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acerra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1543²BornNapoli
20 May 157027.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
Mar 1572³29.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
17 Aug 158744.6AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
13 Dec 158744.9Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
23 Jun 160360.5ResignedBishop of Acerra, Italy
13 Jun 162279.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista del Tufo:
Bishop Giovanni Battista del Tufo C.R. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acerra

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 93
  • ob/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • ob: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,928

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014