Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel de Maldonado, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660²BornOcaña, Spain
21 Jun 170040.4AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
2 Jan 170141.0Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
17 Apr 172868.2DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angel de Maldonado:
Bishop Angel de Maldonado O. Cist. (born 1660, died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,630
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 20, Number 10
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015