Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Hurtado de Mendoza y Ribera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1573BornSanta Olalla
5 Sep 161642.8AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
22 Jan 161743.2Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
17 Mar 162147.3AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
14 Nov 162249.0AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
27 Jan 162753.2AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
1630²56.1ResignedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
22 Oct 163460.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Hurtado de Mendoza y Ribera:
Bishop Francisco Hurtado de Mendoza y Ribera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,412
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 282, and Page 271
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 300, and Page 229
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 135, Number 862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015