Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Díaz de Cabrera, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565¹BornCoronada
6 Aug 161853.5AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
30 Dec 161853.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
30 Sep 163065.7DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Díaz de Cabrera:
Bishop Rafael Díaz de Cabrera O.SS.T. (died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,829
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,384
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 243
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 137, Number 876

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015