Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo (Pedro) de Oña, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹BornBurgos, Spain
27 Aug 160141.6AppointedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
9 Dec 160141.9Ordained BishopBishop of Coro, Venezuela
27 Jun 160545.4AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
13 Oct 162666.7DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo (Pedro) de Oña:
Bishop Domingo (Pedro) de Oña O. de M. (died ) Bishop of Gaeta

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127, and Page 363
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 16,999
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 117, Number 739
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015