Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Miracema do Tocantins

Dioecesis Miracemana Tocantinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 4 October 1989
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Palmas
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Tocatins
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 45,985 (17,761 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte 3
  • Official Web Site: https://diocesedemiracemato.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Praca Derocy Moraes 123, 77650-000 Miracema do Tocantins, TO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (063)3366-2285

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Miracema do Norte
11 October 1966ErectedDiocese of Porto Nacional Territorial Prelature of Miracema do Norte (erected)
Diocese of Miracema do Norte
4 August 1981ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Miracema do Norte Diocese of Miracema do Norte
Diocese of Miracema do Tocantins
4 October 1989Name ChangedDiocese of Miracema do Norte Diocese of Miracema do Tocantins
27 March 1996Territory LostDiocese of Miracema do Tocantins
Diocese of Porto Nacional
Archdiocese of Palmas (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Miracema do Norte
1966100,000.0%36903ap1967
1970120,000125,00096.0%34717,1425106ap1971
197696,500105,56191.4%45910,7226337ap1977
1980119,300134,60088.6%67139,17693612ap1981
Diocese of Miracema do Norte
Diocese of Miracema do Tocantins
1990174,000203,00085.7%551017,40065516ap1991
1999123,812162,91176.0%103139,52442014ap2000
2000125,104164,61176.0%113148,93632214ap2001
2001126,586166,56076.0%123158,43932214ap2002
2002122,102162,80375.0%122148,72122814ap2003
2003135,832181,11075.0%131149,70212314ap2004
2004136,701184,73274.0%132159,11322314ap2005
2013160,000215,70074.2%168246,666182919ap2014
2016151,280221,00068.5%203236,577252619ap2017
2019155,000226,30068.5%192217,3801042722ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast