Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lanzhou [Lanchow]

Archidioecesis Lanceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Han Zhihai, Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 250,000 (96,562 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Lanzhou, Gansu, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kansu
21 June 1878ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi) Vicariate Apostolic of Kansu (erected)
1898Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kansu Mission "Sui Iuris" of I-li o Kul-Dia (erected)
28 April 1905Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kansu Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Kansu {Kansu Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Kansu {Kansu Settentrionale}
28 April 1905Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kansu Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Kansu {Kansu Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Kansu {Kansu Occidentale}
8 March 1922Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Kansu {Kansu Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Western Kansu {Kansu Occidentale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Lanchowfu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Western Kansu {Kansu Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Lanchowfu
14 February 1930Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Lanchowfu Mission "Sui Iuris" of Sinkiang [Xinjiang-Urumqi] (erected)
4 February 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Lanchowfu Prefecture Apostolic of Xining [Sining] (erected)
Archdiocese of Lanzhou [Lanchow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lanchowfu Archdiocese of Lanzhou [Lanchow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Lanzhou [Lanchow]
195017,4654,000,000.4%123244396179289ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.3.2, 24 Dec 2019; Data: 27 Dec 2019

Quantcast