Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janusz Edmund Zimniak

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland

Titular Bishop of Polinianum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1933 Born
9 Sep 195623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
25 Sep 198047.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
25 Sep 198047.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Polinianum
4 Nov 198047.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polinianum
25 Mar 199258.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland
16 Jan 201076.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bielsko-Żywiec, Poland

MicroData Summary for Janusz Edmund Zimniak
Bishop Janusz Edmund Zimniak (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bielsko-Żywiec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTychy
Ordained BishopKatowice, Diocese of Katowice

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bielsko-Żywiec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast