Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Marcos Zapata

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Castabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1866Born
17 Apr 189023.8Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
30 May 191346.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
30 May 191346.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Castabala
29 Mar 191447.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castabala
13 May 195184.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan José Marcos Zapata
Bishop Juan José Marcos Zapata (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbardón
Ordained BishopSan Juan de Cuyo, Diocese of San Juan de Cuyo

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1914, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast