Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barnabé Piedrabuena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tucumán, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Callinicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1863Born
31 May 188622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tucumán, Argentina
16 Dec 190744.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tucumán, Argentina
16 Dec 190744.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cestrus
31 May 190844.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cestrus
8 Nov 191046.9AppointedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
20 Apr 191147.4InstalledBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
11 Jun 192359.5AppointedBishop of Tucumán, Argentina
31 Oct 192359.9InstalledBishop of Tucumán, Argentina
17 Dec 192865.1ResignedBishop of Tucumán, Argentina
17 Dec 192865.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
11 Jun 194278.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Tucumán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Barnabé Piedrabuena
Bishop Barnabé Piedrabuena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tucumán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTucumán
Ordained BishopSt. Michel, Tucumán, Diocese of Tucumán

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1908, Number 40
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,172

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast