Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Américo Orzali

Deceased

Archbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1863Born
19 Dec 188320.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 191148.7AppointedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
10 Mar 191248.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
14 Apr 191249.0InstalledBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
20 Apr 193471.1AppointedArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
18 Apr 193976.0DiedArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Américo Orzali
Archbishop José Américo Orzali (born , died ) Archbishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 15
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,950

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast