Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José del Yermo Santibáñez

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1720AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
16 Jun 1720Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
8 Mar 1728AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
7 Nov 1737DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for José del Yermo Santibáñez (VIAF: 86977510)
Archbishop José del Yermo Santibáñez (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 37, Number 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 66, and Page 166
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast