Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Verdugo Albiturría

Deceased

Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1749Born
27 Jun 179646.8AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
21 Aug 179646.9Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
7 Jul 181868.8DiedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Verdugo Albiturría
Bishop Manuel Verdugo Albiturría (born , died ) Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanarias

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,653
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 115, Number 600
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 144
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast