Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard (Josef) Van Caloen, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Phocaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1853Born
25 May 187421.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Dec 187623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Feb 190551.9AppointedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Mar 190653.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Phocaea
18 Apr 190653.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phocaea
18 May 191562.1ResignedAbbot of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
16 Jan 193278.8DiedAbbot Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gérard (Josef) Van Caloen (VIAF: 88680544)
Bishop Gérard (Josef) Van Caloen O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLophem-lez-Bruges
Ordained PriestMontecassino
Death PlaceCap d’Antibes, South Africa

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 29
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 18 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast